judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL H. PERRY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0535
Short Caption:PAUL H. PERRY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1674-87Filed Date:05/10/1988

Opening Event Date:05/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul H. Perry, Jr.N
Clark U. Fleckinger, IIYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PERRY JR., PAUL H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082688 ORDER: DENY APLT MO TO- NOTE - 01 PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IN- NOTE - 02 ASMUCH AS IT REQ APPROVAL OF NOTE - 02 RT FOR APPEAL W/OU PREJUDICE NOTE - 03 TO ITS RENEWAL BEFORE THE TR NOTE - 03 CT FOR CONS IN THE FIRST IN- NOTE - 04 STANCE; FO: MO FOR EXT TO FILE NOTE - 04 BR IS GRANTED TO EXTENT THAT NOTE - 05 COUNSEL IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE NEC NOTE - 05 STEPS TO CAUSE RT TO BE PROPER NOTE - 06 LY ORDERED & PREPARED FOR THIS NOTE - 06 APPEAL & FILE STATE W/THIS CT NOTE - 07 IN THAT SAME TIME. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 10/12/88 ORD: CLK IS DIRTD TO NOTE - 08 FILE THE LODGED MO OF APLT FOR NOTE - 09 BOND PDG APPEAL AND APLT W/I NOTE - 09 15 DAYS TO FILE A SUPPLEMENT NOTE - 10 TO THE MOTION PURSUANT TO D.C. NOTE - 10 APP. R. 9. NOTE - 11 122388 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 11 IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE NEC STEPS NOTE - 12 TO CAUSE RT TO BE ORD & PRE- NOTE - 12 PARED FOR THIS APPEAL & FILE NOTE - 13 A STATE INDICATING SUCH W/THIS NOTE - 13 CT W/IN THAT SAME TIME.
05/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLARK U. FLECKINGER, II, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 070488 SCHPRD R
07/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER FILING OF TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OF APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD OPE
09/06/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE STATUS REPORT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090588 SCHPRD ANS
09/28/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT PRO SE FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 10 SL PANELPY SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD ANS
10/25/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR EXT. OF TIME TO SUPP. MOTION FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD CHECK
10/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(10/12/88 ORDER FROM JUDGE CUSHENBERRY GRANTING FORMA PAUPERIS MO IN TR CT.) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL SUPPLEMENT TO MO FOR BOND TO 12/23/88. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD Q
12/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL OF APPELLANT & FOR SUPPLE- MENTATION OF PRO SE MOTION FOR BOND MLR PANEL SCDATE 122388 SCHPRD STATE
12/23/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 - 13. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 122388 SCHPRD ANSA
12/28/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS REPORT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD STATE
01/23/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPO TO MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TRIAL COURT'S DENIAL OF BOND PENDING APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989ORDER DENY MO FOR BOND PENDING APPL. ACG PANELFETE SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD CHECK
06/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (150 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 070989 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (155 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD RT
08/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-3-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-13-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/2/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD M
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989ORDER DIRG CLERK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; FO APLE'S BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 122289 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/13/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION TO REMAND APPEAL TO TRIAL COURT FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990RECEIVED LETTER FROM JUDGE CUSHENBERRY RE: STATUS OF INDICTMENT IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD