judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM L. LUMPKIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0536
Short Caption:WILLIAM L. LUMPKIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:88-CF-0536Consolidated: 88-CF-0568 , 88-CF-0614
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14422-87Filed Date:05/09/1988

Opening Event Date:05/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam L. Lumpkin N
David C. Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LUMPKIN, WILLIAM L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEF: HERBERT AUSTIN, THOMAS NOTE - 01 FIELDS NOTE - 02 111488 ORDER: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 THOMAS CLANCY, ESQ. TO W/DRAW NOTE - 03 & AS COUNS FOR APLT IN 88-536 NOTE - 03 & APNTG DAVID C GRAY, ESQ AS NOTE - 04 COUNS FOR APLT; FO: THOMAS NOTE - 04 CLANCY, ESQ. TO TRANSMIT TO - NOTE - 05 NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL THE NOTE - 05 RECORD, INCLUDING RT & ANY NOTE - 06 OTHER MATERIAL NEC FOR COUNS NOTE - 06 USE; FO: SS, CONS 88-536 & NOTE - 07 88-568 & APLT'S BRS DUE 40 DYS NOTE - 07 AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED. NOTE - 08 CON 88-568 & 88-614 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 BRIEF OF APLT IN 88-614 IS NOTE - 09 FILED. FO THAT BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 10 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 10 FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KIERSHS FOR - FIELDS ATTY 2 - TAYLORE FOR - AUSTIN ATTY 3 - GRAYD FOR - LUMPKIN TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BAYN FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 11/14/88
05/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD R
07/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY DAYS AFTER TRANS. IS RECEIVED GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (41 PGS RT - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF 40 DAYS AFTR COMP REC IS FL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD OPE
10/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 07. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(20 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD RT
01/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-568 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (JUDGE WALTON'S ORDER, DTD 1/18/89) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER SS CONS 88-614 88-536 & 88-568 APLTS BRS IN 88-536 & 88-614 DUE IN 40 DAYS; APLE 30 AFT. PANELRBH SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-614 TO APRIL 21, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BA
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (ORDER DATED 4/3/89, JUDGE WALTON) IN 88-614 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED GT PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-5-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL JUNE 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
06/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD BRIEFING IN ABEYANCE FOR 40 DAYS TO JULY 25TH JB PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD IN 88-614 #5(150 PGS/SWARINGER ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD X
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990ORDER DIRG THAT BA IN 88-614 TO BE FLD W/IN 20 DAYS; FO APLE'S BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS THEREAFTR. FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-614 TO 2/28/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR IN 88-614 TO AND INCLUDING 2/28/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 88-614 JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR AN EXT TM TO FL BRIEF IN 88-614 & LODGED SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 10 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD B
05/04/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-4-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER JUDGE CUSHENBERRY DATED 5-1-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 6/4/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(5 PGS/SWARINGER) IN 88-614 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BE
11/02/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 88-568 TO POSTPONE; CASES REMOVED FROM 11/6 REG CAL; RESCHED ASAP. MH PANELROFETY SCDATE 110690 SCHPRD CREG
11/16/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE FOR ARGUMENT ON 11/28 AT 3:00 PM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD CHECK
11/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/28/1990ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/CAUSE RM w/ INSTRUCTIONS SET FORTH IN OP. PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 586 A.2d 701
01/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0366 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD