Case Information: 42740 | |||
Short Caption: | BOZZANO VS. RICCI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D305240 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2004 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/13/2005 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/02/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Minicozzi Law Offices, Ltd.--check no. 6722. | ||
02/02/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-02103 | |
02/11/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/20/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-03313 | |
02/25/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Lansford W. Levitt. (docketing statement) | ||
08/09/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 04-14386 | |
08/10/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. Filed via fax. | 04-14386 | |
10/06/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Counsel of Record. Mr. Toti states that he does not represent respondent in this matter and that he has been erroneously identified as respondent's attorney of record. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Mr. Toti as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Failure to retain new counsel may result in respondent not being permitted to file documents in this appeal. See NRAP 46. If new counsel is retained, new counsel will be expected to participate in the settlement conference program. | 04-18495 | |
12/06/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Removing Appeal from Settlement Conference Program. To date, respondent has not caused new counsel to enter an appearance with this court. We conclude that respondent will not be retaining new counsel to represent her in this appeal. Because respondent is proceeding on appeal in proper person, we remove this appeal from the settlement program. Appellant shall have 15 days form the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Further, appellant shall have 90days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Because respondent is proceeding in proper person, respondent need not file any documents in this appeal unless otherwise ordered by this court. See NRAP 46(b). This appeal shall be submitted for decision upon the filing of the opening brief and appendix. | 04-22153 | |
12/23/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/04/03. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. | 04-23413 | |
01/14/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/4/03. Court Reporter: Shelley Ajoub. | 05-00932 | |
03/07/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-04490 | |
03/07/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 05-04491 | |
03/07/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing of the Transcript of Proceedings. | 05-04492 | |
03/07/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Submitted on record and opening brief. | ||
04/01/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-06413 | |
04/07/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Frank J. Toti as counsel for respondent. | 05-06896 | |
04/13/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 05-07223 | |
04/13/2005 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. Resubmitted for decision on briefs. | ||
07/11/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-13629 | |
08/05/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-13833 | |
08/05/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/12/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2005. | 05-13833 |