Case: D-1810
D-1810
11/22/1991
App Writ of Error
CARROLL R. COCKERELL AND BANK DE INVESTIRE INC. FOR ITSELF AND AS THE SUCCESSOR OF WILLIAM A. HENLEY TRUSTEE; ANBORE INC. A WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF THE SUCCESSOR OF MBANK ABILENE N.A.; AND THE OAKS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
TAYLOR COUNTY AND JIM NED C.I.S.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/24/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Respondent | | |
02/13/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/27/1991 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/22/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/27/1992 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Rehearing Overruled | | |
03/25/1992 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
02/24/1992 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
02/13/1992 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
02/13/1992 | Motion for Rehearing | | | |
02/13/1992 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | RECORD IN CLERKS OFFICE | | |
01/29/1992 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
12/05/1991 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/27/1991 | Reply to Response | | | |
11/22/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/27/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ANBORE, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
BANK DE INVESTIRE, INC | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
CARROLL R. COCKERELL | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
THE OAKS DEVELOPMENT COMPANY | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
MBANK ABILENE, N.A. | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
WILLIAM A. HENLEY, TRUSTEE | Petitioner | Mr. Edward E. Cockerell |
JIM NED C.I.S.D. | Respondent | Mr. Gary L. Hacker |
TAYLOR COUNTY | Respondent | Mr. Gary L. Hacker |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-90-00241-CV
Affirmed as Modified
___ SW2d ___, 08-29-91
11th Court of Appeals
Honorable W. G. ARNOT
Trial Court Information
104th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Billy John Edwards
18,088-B