judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRYANT K. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0227
Short Caption:BRYANT K. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Perjury
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4386-86Filed Date:03/02/1987

Opening Event Date:03/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBryant K. Jones N
Kenneth D. AuerbachYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Barbara J. Valliere YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, BRYANT K. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MARVIN TAYLOR NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 4/19/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 02 TO CONS 87-227 & 87-482; CONS NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 03 COMPLETE REC IN 87-482 IS FL. NOTE - 04 CON 87-188 & 87-482 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 4/25/88 ORD: SS, 4/19/88 ORD NOTE - 05 VACATED TO EXTENT THAT 87-227 NOTE - 06 IS CONS W/PREVIOUSLY CONS NOS. NOTE - 06 87-188 & 87-482; CONS BRF OF NOTE - 07 APLT IN 87-188 & 87-482 DUE NOTE - 07 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS NOTE - 08 FILED IN 87-188 & 87-482. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 8/12/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 09 FOR APLT IN NOS. 87-188 & 87- NOTE - 10 482 TO W/D & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 10 WILLIAM L. PETERS & APPT NOTE - 11 JOSEPH FOR APLT IN 87-188 & NOTE - 11 87-482; NEW COUNSEL TO FL STAT NOTE - 12 IN 20 DAYS INDICATING STATUS NOTE - 12 OF ORDERED RT. NOTE - 13 10/7/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 13 NOS. 87-188 AND 87-482 FOR NOTE - 14 STAY AND ALL PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 14 87-188 AND 87-482 ARE HEREBY NOTE - 15 STAYED PDG DISP. OF THE 23-110 NOTE - 15 MOTION FILED IN TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 16 FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 NOTE - 16 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS CT RE NOTE - 17 STATUS OF SAID MOTION. NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 1/13/89 ORD: THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 18 APLT IN NOS. 87-188 & 87-482 NOTE - 19 TO FILE COPY OF 23-110 MO. NOTE - 19 FILED IN SUP. CT. WITH THIS NOTE - 20 COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS. NOTE - 20 NOTE - 21 030990 ORD: GRANT APLT JONES NOTE - 21 MO TO VACATE STAY OF PROC; F/O NOTE - 22 APLTS' BRFS DUE IN 40 DAYS, NOTE - 22 APLE'S BRF 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BROWNGA FOR - APPELLANT JONES ATTY 2 - JOSEPHE FOR - APLT TAYLOR ATTY 3 - VALLIEREB FOR - APPELLEE
03/02/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GARY T. BROWN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
04/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 050187 SCHPRD R
05/21/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO FILE COMPLETED DOCKETING STATE. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050187 SCHPRD RT
05/28/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 21ST COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD STATE
05/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA; APLT'S BR DUE IN 40 DAYS AFTER THE RT IS FILED W/COURT. PANELPY SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD CHECK
12/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(801 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD RT
12/07/1987RECORD COMPLETED
12/30/1987RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO COURT-APPOINTED AT- TORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/17/88 PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 021788 SCHPRD BA
03/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD V
03/30/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH APPEAL # 87-482 RJG PANEL SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 & 03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD V
04/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051988 SCHPRD R
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (76 PGS - FINNERIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IN 87-482 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD 09-12. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1988STATEMENT OF APLT IN 87-188 & 87-482 REGARDING ESTIMATED COMPLETION DATE OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 091088 SCHPRD STATE
09/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL OF APPELLANT IN 87-188 & 87-482 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 THRU 17 SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING 23-110 MOTION PENDING IN LOWER COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (20 PGS RT - RAMOS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TAYLOR IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRIAL CT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD CHECK
12/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 12/15/88 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD STATE
01/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18 THRU 20 SL PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD N
01/25/1989RECEIVED COPY OF 23-110 MO IN 87-188 & 87-482. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-188 & 87-482 TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF 23-110 MO IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
02/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21-22. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD M
05/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
06/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 28, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; FO THAT THESE APPEALS BE SCHD AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 071890 SCHPRD B
07/23/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/17/1990ARGUED PANELTESTWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE
02/21/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0497
03/19/1992ORDER - that appeal no. 87-227 is hereby severed from appeal nos. 87-188, 87-482, and 89-1466, for the purpose of issuance of the mandate.
03/19/1992MANDATE ISSUED
05/01/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to have attorney appointed to file petition for certiorari to the supreme court
05/07/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Kenneth D. Auerbach, Esq. (petition for writ of certiorari)
05/18/1992LETTER from U.S. Supreme Court re ord granting extension of time to file writ of certiorari to 6/14/92
11/03/1992COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI