judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LANCE MCNAIR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0137
Short Caption:LANCE MCNAIR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 87-CF-0135 Consolidated:87-CF-0137
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3074-82Filed Date:02/02/1987

Opening Event Date:02/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/15/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLance Mcnair N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCNAIR, LANCE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 APPEAL FROM ORDER DENY MOTION NOTE - 01 W/DRAW GUILTY PLEA NOTE - 02 CON 87-135 NOTE - 02
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
02/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 040387 SCHPRD R
04/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-135 & 87-137; COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
05/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1987ORDER CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD DSA
09/15/1987ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT W/EST COMP DATE OF RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (18 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 9/15/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
10/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (50 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 30TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/18/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
01/14/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 1/18/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD CHECK
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 18TH (NO OPA) MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/19/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 031888 SCHPRD BE
04/05/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/19/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD V
04/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 3, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (20 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/15/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN THE U.S. SUPREME COURT JB (#88-6322) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied