Case: 14-07-00093-CR
14-07-00093-CR
02/05/2007
Indecent Exposure
David Sidwell Jenson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/26/2007 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
11/06/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State | |
08/15/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/2009 | Case stored | | |||
05/07/2009 | Mandate issued | | |||
05/04/2009 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
05/01/2009 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
03/25/2009 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | REFUSED | | ||
02/27/2009 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||
01/05/2009 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
12/19/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||
12/04/2008 | Motion for en banc reconsideration disposed | OVERRULED | | ||
12/04/2008 | Motion for rehearing disposed | OVERRULED | | ||
09/03/2008 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
09/03/2008 | Motion for en banc reconsideration filed | | |||
09/03/2008 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
08/19/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
03/27/2008 | Submitted | | |||
01/24/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
11/26/2007 | Reply brief filed | | |||
11/15/2007 | State brief due | | |||
11/06/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
11/06/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/18/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
10/15/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
10/03/2007 | Response due | | |||
09/18/2007 | Notice of late brief | | |||
09/14/2007 | State brief due | | |||
08/15/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
08/15/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
07/25/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
07/16/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||
07/12/2007 | Letter filed | | |||
07/10/2007 | No reporters record filed in criminal case | | |||
06/29/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
06/21/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||
06/20/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
06/20/2007 | Letter filed | | |||
06/20/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
06/05/2007 | No reporters record filed in civil case | | |||
06/01/2007 | Letter filed | | |||
05/28/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
05/28/2007 | Record due | | |||
05/14/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||
03/19/2007 | Letter filed | | |||
02/23/2007 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
02/07/2007 | Trial Court clerks certification letter sent | | |||
02/07/2007 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||
02/05/2007 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
01/31/2007 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
01/26/2007 | Dates sentence imposed in in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/07/2034 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Kevin P. Keating |
Jenson, David Sidwell | Criminal - Appellant | Neal A. Davis |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable LARRY WAYNE STANDLEY
1402367
2 yrs prob/180 days HCJ $2000 fine