judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HERMAN GOODALLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0574
Short Caption:HERMAN GOODALLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10197-87Filed Date:05/10/1988

Opening Event Date:05/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHerman Goodalle N
Lillian Alvarez Mcewen YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GOODALLE, HERMAN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: KELVIN FREELAND NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/27/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 02 EXT TM TO FILE BRF AND CLK IS NOTE - 03 DIRTD TO FILE LODGED BRF; BRF NOTE - 03 OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.
05/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LILLIAN A. McEWEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 6/21/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/07/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD R
07/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (174 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 OR APPMT WILL BE VACATED & REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD DSA
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD DSA
10/11/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE 3/2/88 RT W/IN 30 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD RT
10/26/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(16 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD RT
12/08/1988LETTER DATED 12/5/88, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-APPOINTED AT- TORNEY MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 AND 3 SL PANELRO SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPE
01/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/28/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/28/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD CHECK
02/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/30/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPA
03/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 033089 SCHPRD BE
09/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION OF RE- HEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE PET FOR REH EB WHICH IS TREATED AS A MO. FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REH EB PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD VS
05/14/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIDATED 4-25-90 IN SUPREME COURT #89-7421 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied