judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY T. GORDON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0573
Short Caption:GARY T. GORDON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0446 Consolidated:88-CF-0573, 88-CF-0773
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9810-87Filed Date:05/10/1988

Opening Event Date:05/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGary T. Gordon N
Lillian Alvarez Mcewen YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Per A. Ramfjord YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GORDON, GARY T. AKA GOOEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TONY L. ADAMS, JAMES NOTE - 01 COWAN, ERNEST I. MINDER & NOTE - 02 DAVID L. BELTON NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 082988 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 03 ONLY TO EXTENT THAT CLK TO NOTE - 04 FILE LDGD DSA, FO: REQ FOR RT NOTE - 04 DENIED W/OUT PREJUDICE TO RE- NOTE - 05 NEWAL BEFORE THE TR CT FOR CON NOTE - 05 IN THE 1ST INSTANCE. COUNSEL NOTE - 06 FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE NOTE - 06 NEC STEPS TO CAUSE RT TO BE NOTE - 07 ORD & PREPARED FOR THIS APPEAL NOTE - 07 & FILE STATE INDICATING SUCH NOTE - 08 W/THE CLK OF THIS COURT W/IN NOTE - 08 THAT SAME TIME. NOTE - 09 SEE 88-446 NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 11/22/88 ORD: SS, CON 88-446, NOTE - 10 88-573 & 88-773, BRFS OF APLTS NOTE - 11 IN 88-446 & 88-773 ARE DUE BY NOTE - 11 12/19/88; BRF OF APLT IN THIS NOTE - 12 CASE DUE BY 11/30/88. NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 CON 88-446 & 88-773 NOTE - 13 NOTE - 14 1/25/89 ORD GRT APLT MO FOR NOTE - 14 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/30/89 NOTE - 15 & GRT APLT EXT IN 88-773 TO NOTE - 15 2/17/89 AND FL BRF OF APLT IN NOTE - 16 88-573 W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 1/26/90 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 17 THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY RESCHD NOTE - 18 FOR ARGUMENT ON THE SUMMARY NOTE - 18 CALENDAR OF 2/14/90 AT 2:00 PM
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APLT COWAN ATTY 2 - MCEWENL FOR - APLT GORDON ATTY 3 - RUSSELLS FOR - APLT BELTON TRDATE- 89/11/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RAMFJORDP FOR - APPELLEE
05/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LILLIAN A. McEWEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD R
07/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (923 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS & TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/22/88 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 1/28 - 2/5/88 RT FROM CT RPTR BURNS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 103088 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD M
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (903 PGS SWARINGER)AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(942-1403 PGS BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD STATE
09/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (791 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988ORDER GRANT APLT REQ FOR EXT TO FILE BR & APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD M
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(12 PGS/ PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/30/88 (NO OPE) PB GT PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-12. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-30-88 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/30/88 & APLE TO FL CON BRF 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/28/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/17/89 IN 88-773 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 14-16 PB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER SEE NO. 88-446 FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER TO ORDER IN 88-446 DATED 2/3/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989LETTER SEE NO. 88-446 ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-773 TO MARCH 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-446 JB PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-773 (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 4/17/89 TO FL BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BA
04/18/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-573 EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD OPE
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-773 EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD OPE
04/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLTS MOS & LDGD BRS IN 88-573 & 88-773 ARE FILED; FO: APLE CON BR DUE IN 30 DAYS.EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD CHECK
05/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/24/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRT MOTION BRF OF APLE DUE 6/24/89. PANEL SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD V
06/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 062489 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 7/17/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD OPA
07/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BE
07/28/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, REGARDING STATUS OF CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR RECVD 7/28/89 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S IN 88-773 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 88-773 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/29/1989ARGUED PANELFESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THIS APPEAL IS SCHD FOR REARGUMENT ON THURS. JAN. 18 AT 10:30 A.M. SL PANELRO SCDATE 112989 SCHPRD RDEC
01/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 AND 18 SL PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990MEMORANDUM ARGUED BEFORE JJ FE/TE/SC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION (#88-773 RM FOR RESENTENCING) PANELFETESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE
09/06/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 2629 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD