Case Information: 46608 | |||
Short Caption: | ABELL (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR052113 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/18/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/18/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-01183 | |
01/18/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 13, 2005. Court Reporter: E. Luschar. Filed in district court on: January 12, 2006. | 06-01200 | |
02/27/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/13/05. Court Reporter: Erin Ferretto. | 06-04353 | |
02/27/2006 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 6, 2006. | 06-04486 | |
03/07/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-05015 | |
03/07/2006 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 06-05016 | |
03/28/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-06505 | |
05/22/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-10686 | |
06/16/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-10959 | |
06/16/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/11/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 23, 2006. | 06-10959 |