judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE L. SAMUELS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0610
Short Caption:GEORGE L. SAMUELS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12727-87Filed Date:05/27/1988

Opening Event Date:05/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/10/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge L. Samuels N
James W. Rudasill, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SAMUELS, GEORGE L. UNITED STATES
05/27/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES W. RUDASILL, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (5 PGS RT - KACZOROWSKI) GT PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD R
09/30/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
10/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD Q
11/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR DESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL RECORD AND STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE JB PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989ORDER GRANT REQUEST FOR RT & CLERK OF SUPR CRT TO PREPARE & FILE FORTHWITH AS A SUPP RECORD. PANELMKNW SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD VS
10/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (144 PGS. -- KACZOROWSKI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1989RECORD COMPLETED
03/02/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT WILL BE VACATED JB PANELRO SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BA
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 14 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD BA
04/09/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BRIEF BE FILED W/I 10 DAYS FR DTD OF ORD. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD B
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 18, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
06/18/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990ORDER GRTG MOT & DIRG CLK TO FILE APLE'S LODGED BR; FO CASE TO SCH AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. FH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/07/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT REQUESTING W/DRAWAL OF PRESENT COUNSEL & APPT. OF EFFECTIVE ASSIT. OF COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1991LETTER REFERRING 12/7/90 MO OF APLT TO COUNSEL; DIR RESPONSE IN WRITING IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELJEP SCDATE 121290 SCHPRD TO
11/19/1991MEMORANDUM PER PHONE CONVERSATION WITH ATTY, CASE READY TO BE CALEND (MEH) PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/10/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGSCKN
02/07/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE
02/07/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0355
03/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD