judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL SEDLACEK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-138)
Case Number:06-138Case Docketed On:06/16/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DANIEL SEDLACEK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL SEDLACEK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel SedlacekKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/03/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/23/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time no further extensions consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
11/20/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary (no waiver attached)MotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
11/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (faxed copy)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
11/21/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/21/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal