judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOLCOMB VS. SMITH

Case Information: 34750
Short Caption:HOLCOMB VS. SMITHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A323250Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/31/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
08/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/31/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-08161
08/31/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/14/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to respond in any way to this court's directive to pay the filing fee. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00538
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01977
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2000. 00-01977