Case: 08-04-00335-CV
08-04-00335-CV
11/15/2004
Miscellaneous civil
Joyceline Mills
Dr. John Pate, M. D.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/31/2006 | Fee paid | | |||
06/01/2006 | Publisher's List of Attorneys | | |||
06/01/2006 | Opinion issued | Aff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct |
| ||
12/08/2005 | Submitted | | |||
12/05/2005 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||
11/04/2005 | Submission | | |||
10/24/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/24/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/05/2005 | Order entered | | |||
10/05/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/22/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
09/22/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
08/01/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
08/01/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/01/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
06/24/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
06/24/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/24/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/27/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/26/2005 | supp. record filed (sup clerk/reporters record) | | |||
05/18/2005 | Order entered | | |||
05/18/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/04/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
05/04/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
03/31/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
03/31/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/31/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/18/2005 | Fee paid | | |||
02/18/2005 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/18/2005 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
01/19/2005 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||
01/11/2005 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |||
12/14/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
11/30/2004 | Order entered | | |||
11/29/2004 | Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry | | |||
11/23/2004 | Order entered regarding request for ADR | | |||
11/19/2004 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
11/15/2004 | Fee paid | | |||
11/15/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/07/2006 | Case Stored | Court has determined historical value - case to be permanently retained |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mills, Joyceline | Appellant | Hon. John P. Mobbs Hon. Carlos E. Cardenas |
Pate, M.D. | Appellee | Hon. Larry W. Hicks |
Trial Court Information
346th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Hon. Peter Peca
2003-297