judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ VS. VALDES

Case Information: 34749
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ VS. VALDESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 96DI0880Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/12/2001 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/12/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Richard F. Cornell--check no. 7667.
08/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08142
08/31/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Suzanne Rowe. 99-08143
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February or March, 2000. 99-12892
02/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-03085
03/15/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Santions. 00-04106
03/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Cross-Motion for Sanctions and for Order Sealing Motion to Dismiss, Response, Cross-Motion and Cross-Response. 00-04798
03/30/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Opposition to Cross-Motion for Sanctions and for Order Sealing Motion to Dismiss, Response, Cross-Motion and Cross-Response. 00-05159
07/11/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. On March 15, 2000, appellant filed a motion to dismiss this appeal or, alternatively, for monetary and other sanctions against appellant, based on appellant's refusal to appear in Nevada for a settlement conference. We conclude that sanctions against appellant are unwarranted. We therefore deny respondent's March 15, 2000 motion in its entirety. We conclude that respondent did not violate NRAP 16(h), and we deny appellant's cross-motion for sanctions. We deny appellant's motion to seal portions of the record. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days from the date of this order to file a docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-11872
07/18/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-12432
07/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-13077
11/08/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 8, 2000. 00-19684
12/08/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/08/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-21515
12/08/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-21516
01/08/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/08/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-00383
02/08/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 12, 2001. 01-02649
03/12/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/12/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-04382
05/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 12, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. (NNP01A-MS/DA/RR)
05/25/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/12/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR.
09/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-15141
10/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15353
10/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/12/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 5, 2001. 01-15353