Case Heading (S-07-0111) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0111 | Case Docketed On: | 05/21/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Fremont County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ALAN McOMIE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ALAN McOMIE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Alan McOmie | Michael S. Messenger Bobbi Dean Overfield Thomas Wade Redmon |
Appellee | Department of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Patrick J. Crank John William Renneisen Steven R. Czoschke Kristi Marie Radosevich |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
05/21/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
05/21/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
05/21/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
05/21/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of index | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
07/09/2007 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/22/2007 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/22/2007 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
09/11/2007 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary | Final | |
09/18/2007 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
10/05/2007 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |