judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DERRICK HARPER, ET AL V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REG AFRS

Case Information: 10-AA-0846
Short Caption:DERRICK HARPER, ET AL V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REG AFRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRIS701549-09Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDerrick Harper NPro SeN
PetitionerYolanda Harper NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/15/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/15/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
07/26/2010 ORDERED that petitioner shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code 2-1831.16(a) (2007 Supp.), OAH R. 2811.5. (BY: ETW)
08/16/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
08/31/2010 ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE*****
08/31/2010 F/ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (BY: ETW) lw
12/16/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioners' brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 21, 2010, directing petitioner(s) to file t he brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner(s) brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
03/07/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/07/2011DISMISSED
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED