judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0856
Short Caption:CHARLES E. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5411-10Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/19/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Young Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/02/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a non-final order. See West v. U.S. 346 A.2d 504 (DC 1975). (BY: ETW)
08/02/2010TMC - OTSC
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (292 pgs/Davis) 6/28-30/10 proc. (transferred to appeal no. 10-CF-1317 per Rosanna Mason (pii))
09/24/2010RECORD INDEX
09/24/2010RECORD COPIES
09/28/2010 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS DISMISSED as having been PREMATURELY FILED W/O PREJUDICE to filing a NOA after appellant has been sentenced. See West v. US 346 A.2d 504 (DC 1975);... (KRNBST) (kt)
09/28/2010DISMISSED
10/19/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived