judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RIVERA (DEVAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34756
Short Caption:RIVERA (DEVAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37006 , 43094 , 70943
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141314Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08193
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10274
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11317
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 1999. 99-11317