judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN v. WYOMING STATE BAR COMMITTEE ON RESOLUTION OF FEE DISPUTES; and SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Case Heading (06-143)
Case Number:06-143Case Docketed On:06/22/2006
Linked To: 06-142
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Courts (Title 5)
Short Title:FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN v. WYOMING STATE BAR COMMITTEE ON RESOLUTION OF FEE DISPUTES; and SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Full Title:FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING STATE BAR COMMITTEE ON RESOLUTION OF FEE DISPUTES; and SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C., Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrench Carter WallopDaniel Barry Frank
AppellantScott M. GoodwynDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeResolution of Fee Disputes Committee
AppelleeSpeight, McCue & Associates, P.C.William Mather McKellar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/09/2006Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
09/20/2006Brief - Appellee Speight, McCue & Associates P.C.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/06/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge Nena James and recusing Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge David Park and recusing Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge John Brooks and recusing Justice GoldenOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge Jeffrey Donnell and recusing Justice HillOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/05/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Judge Donnell writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal