judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRANK C. GILLIAN AND WIFE v. W. C. DAY, ET AL.

Case: A-33
A-33
01/15/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK C. GILLIAN AND WIFE
W. C. DAY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/14/1944Letter Filed
06/29/1944Response to Motion filed
06/28/1944Motion to dismiss
04/22/1944Letter Filed
03/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/06/1944Motion to dismiss
01/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. C. Day, et al.Respondent
Frank C. Gillian and WifePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information