Case: 10-10-00049-CR
10-10-00049-CR
02/02/2010
Murder
Matt D. Baker
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/15/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State |
| ||
11/15/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/13/2012 | Case stored | | |||
01/13/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||
12/21/2011 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
11/02/2011 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||
09/08/2011 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||
08/08/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||
07/19/2011 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/06/2011 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
06/28/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/21/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed | | |||
06/16/2011 | Response filed | | |||
06/08/2011 | Submitted | | |||
06/08/2011 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
06/08/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||
06/08/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
05/16/2011 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
03/15/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/15/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||
02/15/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/08/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/14/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/10/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
11/23/2010 | Motion to exceed brief length disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
11/15/2010 | Motion to exceed brief length filed | | |||
11/15/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
10/21/2010 | Recusal of appellate court justice(s) | | |||
10/19/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/18/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
09/21/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/15/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
09/07/2010 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |||
08/31/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/17/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
06/15/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/14/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/19/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||
03/17/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||
02/23/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
02/22/2010 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
02/02/2010 | Notice filed | | |||
02/02/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
01/21/2010 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/13/2112 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State of | Criminal - State of Texas | Alex Bell Abel Reyna |
Baker, Matt D. | Appellant | Stan Schwieger |
Trial Court Information
19th District Court
McLennan
Honorable Ralph T. Strother
2009-0456-C1
65 yrs