Case: 04-06-00885-CR
04-06-00885-CR
12/20/2006
Aggravated Assault
Marcus Dante Thomas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/31/2011 | Letter filed | | |
07/27/2011 | Letter received | | |
04/15/2010 | Letter filed | | |
07/14/2009 | Letter filed | | |
11/24/2008 | Letter filed | | |
05/19/2008 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |
05/16/2008 | Mandate issued | | |
05/16/2008 | Case returned from higher court | | |
05/05/2008 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
04/09/2008 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
02/28/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
02/26/2008 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
02/13/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
01/16/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/16/2008 | Submitted | | |
11/29/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |
10/25/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/24/2007 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
10/24/2007 | Brief Filed | | |
10/16/2007 | Generate a formal court order | | |
10/16/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/12/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
09/12/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/12/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/13/2007 | Generate a formal court order | | |
07/24/2007 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/19/2007 | Brief Filed | | |
07/09/2007 | Generate a formal court order | | |
06/13/2007 | 10 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed | | |
04/30/2007 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
03/21/2007 | Generate a formal court order | | |
03/21/2007 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/19/2007 | Mot. EOT to file reporter's record Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Filing is Noted by Court | |
03/16/2007 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
03/15/2007 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed | | |
03/13/2007 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
03/02/2007 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/10/2007 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
12/26/2006 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
12/20/2006 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
12/20/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/13/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/13/2006 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
11/14/2006 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/16/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/16/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mary Beth Welsh |
Thomas, Marcus Dante | Criminal - Appellant | Suzanne M. Kramer Marcus Dante Thomas |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon MacRae
2006-CR-0853-B
99 YEARS TDCJ & $10,000 FINE