judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YOUNG, ALICE R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-0908
Short Caption:YOUNG, ALICE R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M12423-83Filed Date:06/25/1984

Opening Event Date:06/25/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/18/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Hugh O'Neill YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Curtis E. Hall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOUNG, ALICE R. UNITED STATES
06/25/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/31/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/18/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted