judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-235
A-235
06/20/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ROBERT E. BURROUGHS AND ROGER A. KNIGHT
CLEM FAIN, JOHN LONG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/24/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/24/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/23/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
06/21/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
06/20/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1944Motion to intervene
06/24/1944Response to Petition
06/24/1944Response to Petition
06/24/1944Letter Filed
06/24/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/23/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/21/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
06/21/1944Order from Lower Court filed
06/21/1944Order from Lower Court filed
06/21/1944Letter Filed
06/20/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
06/20/1944Brief in Support of Petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clem FainRespondent
Alton B. ChapmanIntervenor
John LongRespondent
Robert E. Burroughs and Roger A. KnightRelator
Charles L. BlackAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information