judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-228
A-228
06/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FEDERAL UNDERWRITERS EXCHANGE
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/10/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/27/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/24/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/12/1944Response to Motion filed
10/10/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/27/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/24/1944Response to Petition
06/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Federal Underwriters ExchangePetitioner
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information