Case: 98-0935
98-0935
09/28/1998
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
DURINDA DAWN STUBBS guardian of the PERSON and ESTATE OF CLYDE TABOR an incapacitated person
BURINDA BETH ORTEGA guardian of the PERSON and ESTATE OF MARCELLA TABOR an incapacitated person
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/20/1998 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of Durinda Dawn Stubbs | |
09/25/1998 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | attached to petition | |
09/25/1998 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/08/1999 | Case Stored | | | |
02/08/1999 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | order sent to COA | | |
12/31/1998 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
12/31/1998 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
11/30/1998 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Estate of Marcella Tabor | | |
11/30/1998 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Marcella Tabor | | |
11/20/1998 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of Durinda Dawn Stubbs | | |
11/20/1998 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remain in clerk's office | | |
11/05/1998 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
10/06/1998 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/05/1998 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Burinda Beth Ortega & Marcela Tabor; by Atty Ad Litem Robert Gieb | | |
10/02/1998 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Burinda Beth Ortega; by Atty. Mike Windsor | | |
09/25/1998 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |
09/25/1998 | Petition for Review | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/08/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 17-E-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ORTEGA, BURINDA BETH | Respondent | Ms. Kelcie A. Hibbs |
TABOR, MARCELLA | Respondent | Mr. Robert J. Gieb |
ESTATE OF MARCELLA TABOR | Respondent | Mr. Monroe Allan Windsor |
TABOR, CLYDE | Petitioner | Mr. D. Lee Thomas Jr. |
STUBBS, DURINDA DAWN | Petitioner | Mr. D. Lee Thomas Jr. Honorable Andrew L. Vogel |
ESTATE OF CLYDE TABOR | Petitioner | Mr. D. Lee Thomas Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-97-00058-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
977 SW2d 718, 07-09-98
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable SAM DAY
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Tarrant
Honorable Steve Mason King
92-0163-1