Case: 05-98-01637-CV
05-98-01637-CV
10/01/1998
Miscellaneous civil
Grotjohn Precise Connixiones International, S.A., Grotjohn, Dale and Whitten, Frank
JEM Financial, Inc., J.W. Taylor, Jr., Martin Hamilton, John Adams, Sr. and Larry McAlister
No
6th Court of Appeals
11/20/1998
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/20/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/20/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/10/1998 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/28/1998 | Record due | | |
10/19/1998 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/15/1998 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
10/15/1998 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
10/15/1998 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal | | |
10/15/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/12/1998 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
10/12/1998 | Motion Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal | | |
10/01/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/01/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/01/1998 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
10/01/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/01/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/29/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
06/30/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/12/1998 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Renee Carroll | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Renee Carroll |
Jem Financial, Inc., Et Al | Appellee | Robert H. Holmes |
W.l. Chancey | Appellant | Brad Jackson |
Grotjohn Precise Connixiones | Appellant | John A. Hixson |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
CC-96-10538-A