judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BAXTER, JOSEPH M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0212
Short Caption:BAXTER, JOSEPH M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4761-80Filed Date:02/05/1982

Opening Event Date:02/05/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/28/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/02/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/17/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Linda J. RavdinNN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gregory C. Powell NN
AppellantJoseph M. Baxter NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BAXTER, JOSEPH M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 POWELLG FOR FILING WRIT OF CERTIORARI
02/05/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/28/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/02/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/17/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/19/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition