Case: 05-98-01612-CR
05-98-01612-CR
09/29/1998
Other Felony
Robertson, Cornelius Jr
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/23/2000 | Return to storage | | |
03/24/2000 | Record Returned | | |
09/02/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/02/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/25/1999 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
06/25/1999 | Submitted | | |
06/25/1999 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
06/25/1999 | Submission | | |
06/25/1999 | Submitted | | |
05/18/1999 | Submission | | |
05/17/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
05/17/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/17/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/30/1999 | Brief Due | | |
03/31/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
03/31/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/24/1999 | Brief Received | | |
03/21/1999 | Brief Due | | |
03/10/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/09/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
02/26/1999 | Brief Due | | |
02/20/1999 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
02/19/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/27/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/26/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
01/22/1999 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/21/1999 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
01/21/1999 | Record due | | |
10/13/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/01/1998 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
09/29/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/29/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/23/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
09/14/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
09/14/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/02/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Joe Phillips | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 282nd District Court |
Cornelius Robertson Jr | Criminal - Appellant | Jan E. Hemphill |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | April E. Smith |
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Karen J. Greene
F94-02549-QS
50 yrs adj. of guilt