judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE GUARDIANSHIP OF GAULE

Case Information: 34657
Short Caption:IN RE GUARDIANSHIP OF GAULECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33718 , 36647
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G17772Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07460
08/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to pay the filing fee or otherwise respond to our directive, and we conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-08773
10/13/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-09932
10/13/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 1999. 99-09932