judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAMS, STERLING S. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-0869
Short Caption:WILLIAMS, STERLING S. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1726-82Filed Date:06/21/1984

Opening Event Date:06/21/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/29/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/18/1985
Argued/Submitted:10/23/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ray Feldman NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Carl V. AngelisYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mark S. Dreux YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, STERLING S. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 FELDMANR VACATED - 5/22/85
06/21/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/29/1984FiledRecord Completed
06/18/1985FiledBriefing Completed
10/23/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/01/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition