Case: 05-98-01566-CV
05-98-01566-CV
09/24/1998
Mandamus
In re J.B.
Hon. Michael J. O'Neill, Judge, 193rd District Court, Dallas County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
12/09/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/22/1999 | Record Retention | Destroy |
| ||
10/14/1998 | Record Returned | | |||
10/13/1998 | Order Entered | Dismissed | | ||
10/13/1998 | Order Entered | Dismissed | | ||
10/12/1998 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
10/12/1998 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/06/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
10/05/1998 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/05/1998 | Response due | | |||
10/05/1998 | Response to Motion | | |||
09/24/1998 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
09/24/1998 | 75.00 Fee Paid | | |||
09/24/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
09/24/1998 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
09/24/1998 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | | |||
09/24/1998 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
09/24/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/06/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
In Re J.b. | Relator | Mr. Clint Dallas Van Trease Boyd Waggoner |
Leonora Stephens | Real Party in Interest | M. Steve Nagle |
Hon. Michael J. O`neill | Respondent | Dallas Judge |
Timberlawn Psychiatric Hosp | Real Party in Interest | Mickie S. Bragalone |
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
96-13207-L