judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00188-CR
08-89-00188-CR
05/30/1989
Theft
Lerma, Marcella
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/1990Shuck purged
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
05/18/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
04/20/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
02/21/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
01/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1989Submitted
12/01/1989Submission
12/01/1989Submitted
11/20/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/10/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/31/1989Submission
10/11/1989Brief Filed
10/11/1989Case ready to be set
10/11/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/13/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/01/1989Brief Filed
07/03/1989Exhibits Filed
07/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
06/30/1989Miscellaneous filing
06/26/1989Transcript Filed
05/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Thomas S. Morgan
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Al W. Schorre, Jr.
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
CRA-15623(2)
25 yrs TDC