Case: 04-89-00264-CV
04-89-00264-CV
05/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Gary Dean Barsch; Keith Allen Barsch & Marilyn Barsch Lange
Wanda Allyne Barsch (Estate of Ruth V. Barsch, Deceased)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/22/1990 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |
06/22/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/22/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/18/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/18/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/04/1990 | Submitted | | |
01/04/1990 | Submission | | |
01/04/1990 | Submitted | | |
01/03/1990 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
12/28/1989 | Reply brief filed | | |
11/27/1989 | Submission | | |
11/22/1989 | Information regarding cause received | | |
09/22/1989 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
09/22/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
09/22/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/22/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/18/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/07/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/28/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/25/1989 | Verification Filed | | |
08/17/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/14/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
08/14/1989 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
08/14/1989 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
08/03/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/28/1989 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/11/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/10/1989 | Affidavit of Court Reporter Filed | | |
06/30/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/30/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/30/1989 | Exhibits received | | |
06/30/1989 | Exhibits Filed | | |
06/13/1989 | No Description Available. | Abeyance | |
06/13/1989 | No Description Available. | Abeyance | |
06/02/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
05/30/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
05/30/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/28/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
02/02/1989 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/22/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable B. B. Schraub
86-747
n/a