judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00187-CV
08-89-00187-CV
05/30/1989
Workers Compensation
Dir., State Employees Workers' Comp. Div., State of Texas
Dominguez, Jose Luis
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/2011Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/03/1990Shuck purged
05/03/1990Mandate Issued
05/03/1990Mandate Issued
03/19/1990Fee paid
03/12/1990Fee paid
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1990Submitted
02/16/1990Submission
02/16/1990Submitted
02/06/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
02/05/1990Brief Filed
01/05/1990Submission
01/03/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Order entered
12/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
12/27/1989Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
12/22/1989Submission
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
11/06/1989Miscellaneous filing
11/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/10/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Exhibits Filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/08/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
08/30/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
06/14/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1989Transcript Filed
05/30/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
05/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. John A. Cowan
UnknownAppelleeHon. Susan Larsen
UnknownAppellantHon. Joseph A. Pitner
UnknownAppellantHon. Jim Mattox
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
88-4073