judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00189-CV
07-89-00189-CV
05/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Strout, Donald Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1990Mandate Issued
04/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/07/1989Submitted
11/07/1989Submission
10/24/1989Motion to Vacate, i.e. Oral Submission, Stay or OrderOverruled
10/16/1989Submission
09/06/1989Do not use
09/01/1989Brief Filed
09/01/1989Case ready to be set
08/02/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/01/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/21/1989Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
07/10/1989Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
07/10/1989Brief Filed
06/28/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/27/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/30/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
05/30/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
181st District Court
Potter
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
64,347-B