Case: 05-89-00652-CV
05-89-00652-CV
05/30/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hannah, Pearlie
James Madison, Howard Sides, Carl Alley, Rhonda Davenport, M
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
04/18/2001 | Record Pickup | | |
10/21/1997 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
08/17/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/17/1989 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/15/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | |
06/15/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | |
05/30/1989 | MattConv | | |
05/30/1989 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
05/30/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/04/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
03/06/1989 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joseph B. Morris
86-17029-E