judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INTERDONATO, ANDREW P. INTERDONATO, PAUL F.

Case Information: 85-CV-0373
Short Caption:INTERDONATO, ANDREW P. INTERDONATO, PAUL F.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14947-82Filed Date:03/22/1985

Opening Event Date:03/22/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/20/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/26/1985
Argued/Submitted:01/07/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John C. Lenahan YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
W. Gary KohlmanNN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul F. Sheridan NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Leonard C. Collins YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Timothy J. BattleNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901INTERDONATO, ANDREW P. ET AL INTERDONATO, PAUL F.
01/01/1906 LENAHANJ for: ANTONIA I. GIORDANO SHERIDANP for: ANDREW P. INTERDONATO
03/22/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1985FiledRecord Completed
08/26/1985FiledBriefing Completed
01/07/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/24/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition