judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-226
A-226
06/15/1944
MISC PETITION
GULF OIL CORPORATION, E. C. MARRS, ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/02/1944Supplemental Brief filedRelator
09/22/1944Supplement to ResponseRespondent
09/15/1944Supplemental Brief filedRelator
06/27/1944Supplemental Brief filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/01/1944Order from Lower Court filed
10/02/1944Supplemental Brief filed
09/28/1944Affidavit filed
09/22/1944Supplement to Response
09/15/1944Supplemental Brief filed
07/07/1944Response to Motion filed
07/05/1944Letter Filed
06/27/1944Supplemental Brief filed
06/15/1944motion for leave to file petitionOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
E. C. Marrs, et al.Relator
Gulf Oil Corporation Relator
Railroad Commission of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information