judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOHN R. CARVER v. T. F. CRAWFORD AND L. W. BOYER, R. C. LIVERMAN, ET AL.

Case: A-237
A-237
06/21/1944
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN R. CARVER
T. F. CRAWFORD AND L. W. BOYER, R. C. LIVERMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/23/1944Response to Petition
06/30/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/22/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/23/1944Response to Petition
10/20/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
10/11/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/30/1944Response to Petition
06/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/21/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. F. Crawford and L. W. BoyerRespondent
R. C. Liverman, et al.Respondent
John R. CarverPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information