judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILLCOAT VS. STATE

Case Information: 34658
Short Caption:HILLCOAT VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34877
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135089Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07461
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 8/23/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order appealed from filed in district court on: August 23, 1999. 99-09185
10/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 34877. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 34658 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 34877. This appeal shall proceed as an appeal from the order denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus in docket No. 34658. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. SNP Nos. 34658, 34877. Document No. 99-10049. 99-10049
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 10/18/99 Order: transferred from Docket No. 34877 to Docket No. 34658. 99-09112
02/07/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 02/03/00. 00-01855
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08169
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08181
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08181