Case: 99-1191
99-1191
11/29/1999
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
JERRY HOSKINS
MICHAEL MOSES, COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION, SMITHVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT and STEVEN L. TOM, individually and in his official capacity
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/2000 | Case Stored | LOCATION 34-C-1 | | |
01/27/2000 | Motion to dismiss disposed | dismissed as moot | | |
01/21/2000 | Motion to dismiss application for writ of error | Agreed order of dismissal; parties have settled all things in controversy betw een them. | | |
01/20/2000 | Letter Filed | from pet indicating that settlement has been reached, motion to follow. | | |
12/23/1999 | Petition due | Petition is due 01/20/2000. | | |
12/23/1999 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | 2nd m/e/t to file petition for review is granted. Petition is due 01/20/2000. | |
12/20/1999 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Jerry Hoskins 2nd m/e/t to file petition | | |
12/02/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Jerry Hoskins m/e/t to file petition for review was granted until 12/20/99; pe tition is due n/l/t 12/20/99. | |
12/02/1999 | Petition due | Petition for reveiw is due n/l/t 12/20/99. | | |
11/29/1999 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf of Jerry Hoskins | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/27/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 34-C-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HOSKINS, JERRY | Petitioner | Mr. Thomas W. George |
SMITHVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL | Respondent | Mr. George A. Warner Jr. |
TOM, STEVEN L. | Respondent | Mr. George A. Warner Jr. |
COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION | Respondent | Mr. George A. Warner Jr. |
MOSES, MICHAEL | Respondent | Mr. Paul W. Hunn |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-98-00624-CV
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information