Case Information: 82-CF-1215 | |||
Short Caption: | HANEY, JOSEPH UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 09/09/1982 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/09/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/28/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/01/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/04/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HANEY, JOSEPH A/K/A JOSEPH LEE UNITED STATES | |||
09/09/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
02/28/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/01/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/04/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/16/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |