judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONES JR., ULYSSES UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1370
Short Caption:JONES JR., ULYSSES UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 82-CF-1360 Consolidated:82-CF-1370
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F552-80Filed Date:09/23/1982

Opening Event Date:09/23/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/29/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/07/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Seikaly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES JR., ULYSSES UNITED STATES
09/23/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/31/1984FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/07/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/15/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition