judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00288-CV
08-81-00288-CV
12/02/1981
Divorce
Duke, Charles Vernon, Jr.
Duke, Janet Lieberman
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
06/22/1982Mandate Issued
04/14/1982Judgment Issued
04/14/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/14/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/13/1982No description available.
04/06/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/24/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1982Sup. St. of Facts Filed
03/08/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/08/1982No description available.
02/24/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/20/1982Brief Filed
12/21/1981Statement of Facts Filed
12/16/1981No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1981Transcript Filed
12/02/1981No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
80-7443