judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANBACK, DONALD UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1402
Short Caption:STANBACK, DONALD UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F560-81Filed Date:10/15/1982

Opening Event Date:10/15/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/08/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/08/1983
Argued/Submitted:10/13/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Donald W. Evans YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ava J. Abramowitz YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STANBACK, DONALD UNITED STATES
10/15/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/08/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/08/1983FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/16/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition