Case: 04-01-00131-CV
04-01-00131-CV
02/12/2001
Divorce
Christia Parr Mitchell f/k/a Christia Parr Antolik
VictorJohn Antolik
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/24/2020 | Letter received | | |||
09/28/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
01/31/2003 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |||
01/06/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/30/2002 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/11/2002 | Submitted | | |||
01/09/2002 | General information received from a party | | |||
01/09/2002 | Submission | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
12/26/2001 | Reply brief filed | | |||
12/10/2001 | Order Entered | | |||
12/10/2001 | Motion For E.O.T. to File Reply Brief Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/20/2001 | Motion For E.O.T. to File Reply Brief Filed | | |||
11/06/2001 | Requests Oral Argument | | |||
11/06/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
11/06/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/09/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/09/2001 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/05/2001 | Response to Motion Filed | | |||
10/05/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
10/03/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |||
10/03/2001 | Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed | | |||
09/26/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
09/26/2001 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
08/31/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/30/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |||
08/30/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
08/06/2001 | Requests Oral Argument | | |||
08/06/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/06/2001 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
07/17/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/09/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |||
06/21/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
06/14/2001 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
06/13/2001 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |||
05/31/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
05/31/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
05/31/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
05/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
05/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
05/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
05/14/2001 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
03/30/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
03/30/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
03/28/2001 | Late Record Letter To Court Reporter | | |||
03/23/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
03/23/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
03/22/2001 | Case NOT referred to mediation. ADR file closed. | | |||
03/14/2001 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |||
03/14/2001 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/14/2001 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||
02/12/2001 | ADR Addendum filed | | |||
02/12/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
02/12/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
02/12/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/12/2001 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |||
02/12/2001 | Information regarding cause received | | |||
02/12/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/07/2001 | Request for Findings of Fact Filed | | |||
12/14/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
11/14/2000 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | | |||
07/14/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/28/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Victor John Antolik | Appellee | |
Helen E. Antolik, Mitchell B. Antolik, Alexanderia B. Antolik, Minor Children | Civil - Ad Litem | |
Christia Parr Mitchell f/k/a Christia Parr Antolik | Appellant | Chris Mitchell |
Antolik, Victor John | Appellee | Janie A. Shannon Victor John Antolik |
Trial Court Information
57th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Patrick J. Boone
1999-CI-01482