judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00191-CR
10-81-00191-CR
12/02/1981
Manslaughter
Irvin LaWayne Kinsey
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/17/1982Case stored
11/17/1982Mandate issued by this Court
09/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/12/1982Submitted
12/02/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-100-C
5 Years