judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAUNDERS, PATRICK W. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1366
Short Caption:SAUNDERS, PATRICK W. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Attempted Robbery
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3675-81Filed Date:09/29/1982

Opening Event Date:09/29/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/01/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/11/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/15/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David A. Lee NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Patricia A. Broderick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SAUNDERS, PATRICK W. UNITED STATES
09/29/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/01/1983FiledRecord Completed
08/11/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/15/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/23/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition